No. 18-926
Title:Putnam Investments, LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
John Brotherston, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, et al.
Docketed:January 16, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1711)
   Decision Date:October 15, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 11 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 15, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 24 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 15, 2019 to March 15, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 28 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 15, 2019.
Feb 15 2019Brief amicus curiae of Investment Company Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 15 2019Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 15 2019Brief amicus curiae of The American Council of Life Insurers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 14 2019Brief of respondents John Brotherston, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
William McGinley Jay
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
901 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

WJay@goodwinlaw.com
2023464190
Party name: Putnam Investments, LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
James H. Kaster
    Counsel of Record
Nichols Kaster, PLLP
4600 IDS Center
80 S. 8th Street
Minneapolis, MN 55402

kaster@nka.com
612-256-3200
Party name: John Brotherston, et al.
Other
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113

sdvoretzky@jonesday.com
2028793474
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
Mark Andrew Perry
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036-5306

mperry@gibsondunn.com
202-887-3667
Party name: Investment Company Institute
Nicole A. Saharsky
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

nsaharsky@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3052
Party name: The American Council of Life Insurers