No. 18-916
Title:Dex Media, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Click-To-Call Technologies, LP, et al.
Docketed:January 15, 2019
Linked with 18A485
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2015-1242)
   Decision Date:August 16, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 30 2018Application (18A485) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 14, 2018 to December 14, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 07 2018Application (18A485) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 14, 2018.
Nov 19 2018Application (18A485) to extend further the time from December 14, 2018 to January 11, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Written RequestProof of Service
Nov 20 2018Application (18A485) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 11, 2019.
Jan 11 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 14, 2019)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 14, 2019 to March 18, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 14, 2019 to April 1, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 18, 2019, for all respondents.
Feb 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 1, 2019, for all respondents.
Feb 13 2019Brief amicus curiae of Frontier Communications Corporation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 13 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Association for Accessible Medicines filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 14 2019Brief amicus curiae of Superior Communications, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 1, 2019 to May 1, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 19 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 1, 2019, for all respondents.
Mar 26 2019Motion of Click-to-Call Technologies, LP, to extend the time to file a response from May 1, 2019 to May 8, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 8, 2019.
May 01 2019Brief of Federal Respondent in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 08 2019Brief of respondents Click-To-Call Technologies, LP,, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 17 2019Reply of petitioner Dex Media, Inc., filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 21 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2019.
May 28 2019Rescheduled.
May 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019.
Jun 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 24 2019Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
Jul 09 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 09 2019Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner DEX MEDIA, INC.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 09 2019Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 22, 2019. The time to file respondents' briefs on the merits is extended to and including October 7, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Adam Howard Charnes
    Counsel of Record
Kilpatrick Townsend
2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 4400
Dallas, TX 75201

acharnes@kilpatricktownsend.com
214-922-7106
Party name: DEX MEDIA, INC.,
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Click-to-Call technologies, LP, et al.
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Geyser P.C.
One Energy Square
4925 Greenville Ave., Ste. 200
Dallas, TX 75206

daniel.geyser@geyserpc.com
214-800-2660
Party name: Click-To-Call Technologies, LP,, et al.
Other
Paul R. Garcia
    Counsel of Record
Frontier Communications Corporation
401 Merritt Seven
Norwalk, CT 06851

Paul.Garcia@ftr.com
203-614-5214
Party name: Frontier Communications Corporation
Andrew Martin Jacobs
    Counsel of Record
Snell & Wilmer LLP
One South Church Avenue
400 East Van Buren Street, Ste.
Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

ajacobs@swlaw.com
602-382-6000
Party name: Superior Communications, Inc.
William A. Rakoczy
    Counsel of Record
RAKOCZY MOLINO MAZZOCHI SIWIK LLP
6 West Hubbard St.
Suite 500
Chicago, IL 60654

wrakoczy@rmmslegal.com
312-527-2157
Party name: The Association for Accessible Medicines