No. 18-9130 | |
Title: | Shaun Allen Dick, Petitioner v. Oregon |
Docketed: | May 3, 2019 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeals of Oregon |
Case Numbers: | (A163648) |
Decision Date: | August 15, 2018 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 26, 2018 |
Discretionary Court Decision Date: | January 31, 2019 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Apr 30 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 3, 2019) |
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | |
May 08 2019 | Waiver of right of respondent Oregon to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
May 15 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2019. |
May 24 2019 | Response Requested. (Due June 24, 2019) |
Jun 24 2019 | Brief of respondent Oregon in opposition filed. |
Main Document | |
Jul 11 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. |
Apr 20 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/24/2020. |
Apr 27 2020 | Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Ramos v. Louisiana, 590 U. S. ___ (2020). Justice Alito, concurring in the decision to grant, vacate, and remand: In this and in all other cases in which the Court grants, vacates, and remands in light of Ramos v. Louisiana, I concur in the judgment on the understanding that the Court is not deciding or expressing a view on whether the question was properly raised below but is instead leaving that question to be decided on remand. |
May 30 2020 | MANDATE ISSUED. |
May 30 2020 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Ernest G. Lannet Counsel of Record | Office of Public Defense Services 1175 Court Street NE Salem, OR 97301 ernest.lannet@opds.state.or.us | 5033783349 |
Party name: Shaun Allen Dick | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Benjamin Noah Gutman Counsel of Record | Oregon Department of Justice 1162 Court St NE Salem, OR 97301 benjamin.gutman@doj.state.or.us | 5033784402 |
Party name: Oregon |