No. 18-913
Title:Joshua Brennan, Petitioner
v.
James Dawson, et al.
Docketed:January 15, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2210)
   Decision Date:October 15, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 11 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 14, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 14 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 14, 2019 to March 18, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 19 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 18, 2019.
Mar 18 2019Motion of Deputy James Dawson, et al. for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (March 19, 2019 -- Corrected version submitted)
Mar 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 18, 2019 to April 17, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 21 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 17, 2019.
Apr 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 17, 2019 to April 24, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 19 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 24, 2019.
May 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2019.
May 22 2019Response Requested. (Due June 21, 2019)
Jul 08 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 21, 2019 to July 26, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 26, 2019.
Sep 05 2019Motion of Deputy James Dawson, et al. for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (September 10, 2019)
Sep 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 26, 2019 to September 25, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 13 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 25, 2019.
Sep 13 2019Brief of respondent Deputy James Dawson in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 01 2019Reply of petitioner Joshua Brennan filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 02 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/18/2019.
Oct 15 2019Rescheduled.
Nov 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/13/2019.
Dec 11 2019Rescheduled.
Jan 06 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020.
Jan 08 2020Rescheduled.
Apr 28 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020.
May 13 2020Rescheduled.
May 18 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/21/2020.
May 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/28/2020.
Jun 01 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/4/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Tillman J. Breckenridge
    Counsel of Record
Breckenridge PLLC
1325 G. St., NW
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20005

tjb@breckenridgepllc.com
2025677733
Party name: Joshua Brennan
Attorneys for Respondents
Marcelyn A. Stepanski
    Counsel of Record
Rosati Schultz Joppich & Amtsbuechler, P.C.
27555 Executive Drive
Suite 250
Farmington Hills, MI 48331

mstepanski@rsjalaw.com
2484894100
Party name: Deputy James Dawson, et al.