No. 18-899
Title:Saint Regis Mohawk Tribe. et al., Petitioners
v.
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al.
Docketed:January 11, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-1638, 2018-1639, 2018-1640 ,2018-1641, 2018-1642, 2018-1643)
   Decision Date:July 20, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:October 22, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 20 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 11, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 11, 2019 to March 11, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 11, 2019.
Mar 06 2019Brief of respondents Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 18 2019Reply of petitioners Saint Regis Mohawk Tribe and Allergan, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jonathan S. Massey
    Counsel of Record
Massey & Gail, LLP
1000 Maine Avenue SW
Suite 450
Washington, DC 20024

jmassey@masseygail.com
202-652-4511
Party name: Saint Regis Mohawk Tribe and Allergan, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Charles G. Curtis Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
33 East Main Street
Suite 201
Madison, WI 53703

ccurtis@perkinscoie.com
6086635411
Party name: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.