No. 18-896
Title:Missouri Ethics Commission, et al., Petitioners
v.
Free and Fair Election Fund, et al.
Docketed:January 10, 2019
Linked with 18A596
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2239)
   Decision Date:September 10, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 26 2018Application (18A596) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 9, 2018 to February 7, 2019, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentOther
Dec 07 2018Application (18A596) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until January 8, 2019.
Jan 08 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 11, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 23 2019Waiver of right of respondents Free and Fair Election Fund; Missourians for Worker Freedom; American Democracy Alliance; Herzog Services, Inc.; Farmers State Bank; John Elliott to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 24 2019Waiver of right of respondents Missouri Electric Cooperatives, Association of Missouri Electric Cooperatives-PAC, Legends Bank, David Klindt to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 06 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 13 2019Response Requested. (Due March 15, 2019)
Mar 15 2019Brief of respondents Free and Fair Election Fund, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 15 2019Brief of respondents Missouri Electric Cooperatives, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Julie Marie Blake
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, Supreme Court Building
207 W. High St. P.O. Box 899
Jefferson City,, MO 65102

julie.blake@ago.mo.gov
573-751-3321
Party name: Missouri Ethics Commission, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Edward Dean Greim
    Counsel of Record
Graves Garrett LLC
1100 Main Street, Suite 2700
Kansas City, MO 64105

edgreim@gravesgarrett.com
816-256-3181
Party name: Free and Fair Election Fund; Missourians for Worker Freedom; American Democracy Alliance; Herzog Services, Inc.; Farmers State Bank; John Elliott
Charles W. Hatfield
    Counsel of Record
Stinson Leonard Street LLP
230 W. McCarty St.
Jefferson City, MO 65101

chuck.hatfield@stinson.com
5736366263
Party name: Missouri Electric Cooperatives, Association of Missouri Electric Cooperatives-PAC, Legends Bank, David Klindt