No. 18-89
Title:AmeriCulture, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Los Lobos Renewable Power, LLC, et al.
Docketed:July 18, 2018
Linked with 17A1064
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-2046)
   Decision Date:March 12, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 29 2018Application (17A1064) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 10, 2018 to July 16, 2018, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 04 2018Application (17A1064) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until July 16, 2018.
Jul 16 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 17, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 09 2018Waiver of right of respondent Lightning Dock Geothermal, HI - 01, LLC to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Aug 27 2018Response Requested. (Due September 26, 2018)
Sep 13 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 26, 2018 to October 26, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 26, 2018, for all respondents.
Oct 26 2018Brief of respondents Lightning Dock Geothermal, HI - 01, LLC in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 09 2018Reply of petitioners AmeriCulture, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Scott E. Gant
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
1401 New York Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20005

sgant@bsfllp.com
202-237-2727
Party name: AmeriCulture, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Earl E. DeBrine Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Suite 1000
500 Fourth Street, N.W.
P. O. Box 2168
Albuquerque, NM 87103

edebrine@modrall.com
505-848-1800
Party name: Los Lobos Renewable Power, LLC
Shawn Patrick Regan
    Counsel of Record
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
200 Park Avenue
52nd Floor
New York, NY 10166

sregan@huntonak.com
(212)-309-1046
Party name: Lightning Dock Geothermal, HI - 01, LLC