No. 18-8801
Title:Patrick Joseph Terry, Petitioner
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:April 11, 2019
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(PC-2018-1076)
   Decision Date:February 25, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 04 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 13, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
May 29 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019.
Jun 04 2019Response Requested. (Due July 5, 2019)
Jun 13 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 5, 2019 to August 5, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 19 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 5, 2019.
Aug 05 2019Brief of respondent Oklahoma in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 22 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Oct 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2019.
Oct 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/18/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Patrick Joseph Terry97730
P.O. Box 548
Lexington, OK 73051-0548

Party name: Patrick Joseph Terry
Attorneys for Respondent
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: Oklahoma