No. 18-86
Vide 18-84
Title:The Sherwin-Williams Company, Petitioner
v.
California
Docketed:July 18, 2018
Linked with 17A1163
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Sixth Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(H040880)
   Decision Date:November 14, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:February 14, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 20 2018Application (17A1163) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 15, 2018 to June 14, 2018, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 25 2018Application (17A1163) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until June 14, 2018.
May 21 2018Application (17A1163) to extend further the time from June 14, 2018 to July 14, 2018, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Written RequestProof of Service
May 22 2018Application (17A1163) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until July 14, 2018.
Jul 16 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 17, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, The Sherwin-Williams Company.
Blanket Consent
Jul 30 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, The People of California.
Blanket Consent
Aug 03 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 17, 2018 to September 17, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 17, 2018.
Aug 16 2018Brief amici curiae of States of Indiana, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 17 2018Brief amicus curiae of American Coatings Association filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 17 2018Brief amicus curiae of Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 17 2018Brief amicus curiae of The National Organization of African Americans in Housing filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 17 2018Brief amicus curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 17 2018Brief amici curiae of National Association of Manufacturers, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 17 2018Brief amici curiae of Civil Justice Association of California, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 17 2018Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 17 2018Brief amici curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation and Association of National Advertisers filed.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 17 2018Brief amicus curiae of Distinguished Legal Scholars filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 22 2018Brief of respondent The People of California in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 04 2018Reply of petitioner The Sherwin-Williams Company filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 20 2018Rescheduled.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Leon F. DeJulius Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
500 Grant Street
Suite 4500
Pittsburgh, PA 15219

lfdejulius@jonesday.com
412-394-9528
Party name: The Sherwin-Williams Company
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael Rubin
    Counsel of Record
Altshuler & Berzon
177 Post Street
San Francisco, CA 94108

mrubin@altber.com
415-421-7151
Party name: The People of California
Other
Daniel H. Bromberg
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
555 Twin Dolphin Drive
5th Floor
Redwood Shores, CA 94065

danbromberg@quinnemanuel.com
650-801-5008
Party name: Distinguished Legal Scholars
Jeffrey S. Bucholtz
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

jbucholtz@kslaw.com
202-737-0500
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Indiana Attorney General
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: States of Indiana, et al.
Robert B. Gilbreath
    Counsel of Record
Hawkins Parnell Thackston & Young LLP
4514 Cole Avenue
Suite 500
Dallas, TX 75205

rgilbreath@hptylaw.com
214-780-5114
Party name: The National Organization of African Americans in Housing
Philip S. Goldberg
    Counsel of Record
Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP
1155 F Street NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20004

pgoldberg@shb.com
202-783-8400
Party name: National Association of Manufacturers, et al.
Fred J. Hiestand
    Counsel of Record
Fred J. Hiestand, A Professional Corporation
3418 3rd Avenue, Suite 1
Sacramento, CA 95817

fred@fjh-law.com
916-448-5100
Party name: Civil Justice Association of California, et al.
Martin Sander Kaufman
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
500 Mamaroneck Avenue
Suite 320
Harrison, NY 10528

mskaufman@atlanticlegal.org
914-834-3322
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation and Association of National Advertisers
Eric G. Lasker
    Counsel of Record
Hollingworth LLP
1350 I Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

elasker@hollingsworthllp.com
202-898-5800
Party name: American Coatings Association
Alan Jay Lazarus
    Counsel of Record
Drinker, Biddle & Reath, LLP
50 Fremont Street, 20th Fl.
San Francisco, CA 94105-2235

alan.lazarus@dbr.com
(415) 591-7500
Party name: Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc.
Pratik Arvind Shah
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
1333 New Hampshire Ave., NW
Washington, DC 02109

pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4000
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc.