No. 18-8341
Title:Louie M. Schexnayder, Jr., Petitioner
v.
Darrel Vannoy, Warden
Docketed:March 8, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-30670)
   Decision Date:December 28, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:January 18, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 18 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 8, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Mar 18 2019Waiver of right of respondent Darrel Vannoy to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 25 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Darrel Vannoy.
Blanket Consent
Mar 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019.
Mar 29 2019Blanket Consent and letter filed by Petitioner, Louie M. Schexnayder
Blanket Consent
Apr 04 2019Brief amicus curiae of The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Apr 08 2019Affidavit of Service filed with respect to the brief of amicus curiae for the National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers.
Main Document
Apr 08 2019Certificate of Compliance filed with respect to the brief of amicus curiae for the National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers.
Main Document
Apr 09 2019Response Requested. (Due May 9, 2019)
Apr 17 2019Motion of Darrel Vannoy for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (April 22, 2019 -- Corrected version submitted)
Apr 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 9, 2019 to June 10, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 22 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 10, 2019.
May 01 2019Letter and Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or neither party received from petitioner.
Jun 10 2019Brief of respondent Darrel Vannoy in opposition filed.
Main Document
Jun 26 2019Reply of petitioner Louie M. Schexnayder filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 27 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Sep 24 2019Rescheduled.
Oct 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2019.
Oct 10 2019Rescheduled.
Oct 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/18/2019.
Oct 16 2019Rescheduled.
Oct 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/1/2019.
Oct 28 2019Rescheduled.
Nov 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/8/2019.
Nov 06 2019Rescheduled.
Nov 12 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/15/2019.
Nov 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/22/2019.
Dec 02 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/6/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Amir H. Ali
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
777 6th St. NW
11th Floor
Washington, DC 20001

amir.ali@macarthurjustice.org
202-869-3434
Party name: Louie M. Schexnayder
Louie M. Schexnayder#108097, Spruce - 1
Louisiana State Prison
Angola, LA 70712

Party name: Louie M. Schexnayder
Attorneys for Respondent
Terry M. Boudreaux
    Counsel of Record
District Attorney's Office
200 Derbigny Street
Gretna, LA 70053-0000

tboudreaux@jpda.us
504-368-1020
Party name: Darrel Vannoy
Other
Stephen Lee Shackelford Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Susman Godfrey, LLP
1301 Avenue of the Americas
32nd Fl
New York, NY 10019

sshackelford@susmangodfrey.com
212-336-8330
Party name: The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers