No. 18-830
Title:Township of Millburn, New Jersey, et al., Petitioners
v.
Michael J. Palardy, Jr.
Docketed:January 3, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2597)
   Decision Date:September 28, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 27 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 4, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 4, 2019 to March 6, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 28 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 6, 2019.
Feb 04 2019Brief amici curiae of International Municipal Lawyers Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2019Brief of respondent Michael Palardy, Jr. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Mar 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019.
Mar 20 2019Reply of petitioners Township of Millburn, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

gregory.garre@lw.com
202-637-2207
Party name: Township of Millburn, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Michael Palardy, Jr.
Other
John Michael Baker
    Counsel of Record
Greene Espel, PLLP
222 South Ninth Street
Suite 2200
Minneapolis, MN 55402

jbaker@greeneespel.com
612-373-0830
Party name: International Municipal Lawyers Association and National School Boards Association