No. 18-827
Title:Amir Francis Shabo, Petitioner
v.
William P. Barr, Attorney General
Docketed:January 2, 2019
Linked with 18A400
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-3881)
   Decision Date:June 11, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:July 31, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 15 2018Application (18A400) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 29, 2018 to December 28, 2018, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Oct 15 2018Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Oct 16 2018Application (18A400) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until December 28, 2018.
Dec 28 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 1, 2019)
Jan 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 1, 2019 to March 4, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Jan 28 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 4, 2019.
Feb 28 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 4, 2019 to April 3, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Mar 01 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 3, 2019.
Apr 03 2019Brief of respondent William P. Barr, Attorney General in opposition filed.
Apr 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019.
Apr 17 2019Reply of petitioner Amir Francis Shabo filed. (Distributed)
May 13 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul Whitfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

PHughes@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: Amir Francis Shabo
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: William P. Barr, Attorney General