No. 18-814
Title:Maurice Walker, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Petitioner
v.
City of Calhoun, Georgia
Docketed:December 27, 2018
Linked with 18A503
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-13139)
   Decision Date:August 22, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 08 2018Application (18A503) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 20, 2018 to December 20, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Nov 09 2018Application (18A503) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until December 20, 2018.
Dec 20 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 28, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 28, 2019 to February 27, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 07 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Maurice Walker.
Blanket Consent
Jan 08 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 27, 2019.
Jan 17 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, City of Calhoun, Georgia.
Blanket Consent
Jan 28 2019Brief amici curiae of Law Professors of Criminal, Procedural, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 28 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 28 2019Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 28 2019Brief amici curiae of National Association of Pretrial Services Agencies, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel Stephen Volchok
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

daniel.volchok@wilmerhale.com
2026636103
Party name: Maurice Walker
Daniel Stephen Volchok
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

daniel.volchok@wilmerhale.com
2026636103
Party name: Maurice Walker
Attorneys for Respondent
Jesse Anderson Davis
    Counsel of Record
Brinson, Askew, et al.
615 W. First Street
P.O. Box 5007
Rome, GA 30162-5007

adavis@brinson-askew.com
7062918853
Party name: City of Calhoun, Georgia
Other
Robert M. Carlson
    Counsel of Record
Corette Pohlman, et al.
129 W. Park
Butte, MT 59701

abapresident@americanbar.org
312-988-5000
Party name: American Bar Association
Ilana Beth Gelfman
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
100 High Street
Boston, MA 02110

igelfman@jonesday.com
(617) 960-3939
Party name: Law Professors of Criminal, Procedural, and Constitutional Law
Jay Remington Schweikert
    Counsel of Record
The Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

jschweikert@cato.org
2022161461
Party name: Cato Institute
Jeffrey William Sheehan
    Counsel of Record
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
1600 Division Street, Suite 700
Nashville, TN 37203

jsheehan@bradley.com
(615) 252-2392
Party name: National Association of Pretrial Services Agencies, Pretrial Justice Institute, and National Association for Public Defense