No. 18-810
Title:John Maguire, et al., Petitioners
v.
Anika Edrei, et al.
Docketed:December 26, 2018
Linked with 18A536
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2065)
   Decision Date:June 13, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:August 30, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 15 2018Application (18A536) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 28, 2018 to December 19, 2018, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main Document
Nov 21 2018Application (18A536) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until December 19, 2018.
Dec 19 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 25, 2019)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 16 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 25, 2019 to February 25, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 25, 2019.
Feb 20 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 25, 2019 to March 27, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 22 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 27, 2019.
Mar 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 27, 2019 to April 26, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 25 2019Response to motion from petitioner Lieutenant John Maguire, et al. filed.
Main Document
Mar 26 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is further extended to and including April 12, 2019.
Apr 12 2019Brief of respondents Edrei Anika, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 29 2019Reply of petitioners Lieutenant John Maguire, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Richard Paul Dearing
    Counsel of Record
Corporation Counsel City of New York
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007

rdearing@law.nyc.gov
2123562500
Party name: Lieutenant John Maguire, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Paul Whitfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

PHughes@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: Edrei Anika, et al.