No. 18-801
Title:Laura Peter, Deputy Director, Patent and Trademark Office, Petitioner
v.
NantKwest, Inc.
Docketed:December 21, 2018
Linked with 18A369
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2016-1794)
   Decision Date:July 27, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 04 2018Application (18A369) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 25, 2018 to November 23, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 05 2018Application (18A369) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until November 23, 2018.
Nov 13 2018Application (18A369) to extend further the time from November 23, 2018 to December 21, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Proof of ServiceWritten Request
Nov 14 2018Application (18A369) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 21, 2018.
Dec 21 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 22, 2019)
PetitionPetition
Jan 22 2019Brief of respondent NantKwest, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 04 2019Reply of petitioner Andrei Iancu filed.
Main DocumentMain Document
Feb 06 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2019.
Mar 04 2019Petition GRANTED.
Mar 26 2019Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Apr 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits is granted. The time to file joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including May 17, 2019. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 15, 2019.
May 08 2019Letter of substitution of petitioner received.
Main Document
May 17 2019Brief of petitioner Laura Peter, Deputy Director, Patent and Trademark Office, filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 17 2019Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 23 2019Brief amicus curiae of R Street Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 24 2019Brief amicus curiae of Federal Circuit Bar Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Laura Peter, Deputy Director, Patent and Trademark Office
Attorneys for Respondent
Morgan Chu
    Counsel of Record
Irell & Manella
1800 Avenue of the Stars
Suite 900
Los Angeles, CA 90067-4276

MChu@Irell.com
3102771010
Party name: NantKwest, Inc.
Other
William Paul Atkins
    Counsel of Record
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
1650 Tysons Boulevard
14th Floor
Mclean, VA 22102

william.atkins@pillsburylaw.com
703-770-7900
Party name: Federal Circuit Bar Association
Charles Duan
    Counsel of Record
R Street Institute
1212 New York Ave NW Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

cduan@rstreet.org
(202) 525-5717
Party name: R Street Institute