No. 18-782 | |
Title: | William C. Bond, Petitioner v. United States, et al. |
Docketed: | December 20, 2018 |
Linked with 18A418 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (17-2150) |
Decision Date: | August 2, 2018 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Oct 19 2018 | Application (18A418) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 31, 2018 to December 17, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Oct 22 2018 | Application (18A418) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 17, 2018. |
Dec 17 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 22, 2019) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 10 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 22, 2019 to February 22, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jan 11 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 22, 2019. |
Feb 05 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 22, 2019 to March 25, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Feb 06 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 25, 2019. |
Mar 25 2019 | Brief of respondents United States, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 09 2019 | Reply of petitioner William C. Bond filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 10 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2019. |
Apr 29 2019 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
David Boies Counsel of Record | Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP Boies Schiller Flexner LLP 333 Main Street Armonk, NY 10504 dboies@bsfllp.com | (914) 749-8200 |
Party name: William C. Bond | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Noel J. Francisco Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States, et al. |