No. 18-78
Title:J. Cruz Ramirez-Barajas, Petitioner
v.
Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting Attorney General
Docketed:July 17, 2018
Linked with 17A1197, 17A1182
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-4014, 17-1618)
   Decision Date:December 15, 2017
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:February 15, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 30 2018Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Apr 30 2018Application (17A1197) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 10, 2018 to July 9, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
May 01 2018Application (17A1197) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until June 11, 2018.
May 02 2018Application (17A1182) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until June 15, 2018.
May 02 2018Application (17A1182) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 16, 2018 to June 15, 2018, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
May 25 2018Application (17A1182) to extend further the time from June 15, 2018 to July 15, 2018, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
May 25 2018Application (17A1197) to extend further the time from June 11, 2018 to July 11, 2018, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
May 29 2018Application (17A1197) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until July 9, 2018.
May 29 2018Application (17A1182) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until July 16, 2018.
Jul 09 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 16, 2018)
Aug 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 16, 2018 to September 17, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Aug 09 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 17, 2018.
Sep 10 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 17, 2018 to October 17, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Sep 11 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 17, 2018.
Oct 17 2018Brief of respondent Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General in opposition filed.
Oct 30 2018Reply of petitioner J. Cruz Ramirez-Barajas filed.
Oct 31 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/16/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kelsi Brown Corkran
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

kcorkran@orrick.com
202-339-8400
Party name: J. Cruz Ramirez-Barajas
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting Attorney General