No. 18-779
Title:Power Integrations Inc., Petitioner
v.
Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., et al.
Docketed:December 19, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2016-2691, 2017-1875)
   Decision Date:September 20, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 19 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 18, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2019Brief of respondents Fairchild Semiconductor Int'l Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 06 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 06 2019Reply of petitioner Power Integrations, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

gregory.garre@lw.com
202-637-2207
Party name: Power Integrations, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Kathleen Marie Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
51 Madison Ave., 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10010

kathleensullivan@quinnemanuel.com
(212) 849-7000
Party name: Fairchild Semiconductor Int'l Inc., et al.