No. 18-774
Title:Anderson News, L.L.C., et al., Petitioners
v.
American Media, Inc., et al.
Docketed:December 19, 2018
Linked with 18A366
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-2714, 15-2889, 15-2894, 15-2903)
   Decision Date:July 19, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 04 2018Application (18A366) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 17, 2018 to December 14, 2018, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 05 2018Application (18A366) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until December 14, 2018.
Dec 14 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 18, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 31 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 18, 2019 to February 19, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 02 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 19, 2019, for all respondents.
Feb 19 2019Brief of respondents American Media, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael K. Kellogg
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

mkellogg@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7902
Party name: Anderson News, L.L.C., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
George G. Gordon
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
Cira Centre
2929 Arch Street
Philadelphia, PA 19104

george.gordon@dechert.com
215 994 2382
Party name: Curtis Circulation Company, et al.
David G. Keyko
    Counsel of Record
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
1540 Broadway
New York, NY 10036-4039

david.keyko@pillsburylaw.com
212-858-1064
Party name: American Media, Inc., and Distribution Services, Inc.