No. 18-763
Title:Chaka Fattah, Sr., Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 14, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-4397, 17-1346)
   Decision Date:August 9, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:September 13, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 12 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 14, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 14, 2019 to February 13, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 13, 2019.
Feb 13 2019Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentMain Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark Thomas Stancil
    Counsel of Record
Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP
2000 K Street, NW
4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

mstancil@robbinsrussell.com
202-775-4520
Party name: Chaka Fattah Sr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States