No. 18-759
Title:Matthew D. Sample, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 14, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2086)
   Decision Date:August 27, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:September 14, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 13 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 14, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 08 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Matthew D. Sample.
Blanket Consent
Jan 10 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 14, 2019 to February 13, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 13, 2019.
Jan 14 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 14 2019Brief amici curiae of National Organization for Victim Assistance, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 13, 2019 to March 15, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 31 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 15, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey L. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
2765 Sand Hill Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025

jlfisher@law.stanford.edu
(650) 473-2633
Party name: Jeffrey L. Fisher
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Clifford Warren Berlow
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
353 North Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60654

cberlow@jenner.com
312-840-7366
Party name: The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Alan Evan Schoenfeld
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale and Dorr, LLP
7 World Trade Center, 250 Greenwich Street
New York, NY 10007

alan.schoenfeld@wilmerhale.com
212-230-8800
Party name: National Organization for Victim Assistance, National Crime Victim Law Institute, and Arizona Voice for Crime Victims, Inc.