No. 18-742
Title:Brandon Washington, Petitioner
v.
Alabama
Docketed:December 11, 2018
Linked with 18A332
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Alabama
   Case Numbers:(CR-16-0510)
   Decision Date:April 20, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:May 11, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:July 13, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 27 2018Application (18A332) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 11, 2018 to December 10, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Sep 28 2018Application (18A332) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until December 10, 2018.
Dec 10 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 10, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 13 2018Waiver of right of respondent State of Alabama to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 02 2019Response Requested. (Due February 1, 2019)
Jan 18 2019Brief of respondent State of Alabama in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 01 2019Reply of petitioner Brandon Washington filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 06 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric J Weiss
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie, LLP
1201 Third Avenue, Suite 4900
Seattle, WA 98101

eweiss@perkinscoie.com
2063598000
Party name: Brandon Washington
Attorneys for Respondent
Jack William Willis
    Counsel of Record
AL Attorney General's Office
501 Washington Ave
Montgomery, AL 36130

jwillis@ago.state.al.us
334-242-7326
Party name: State of Alabama