No. 18-729 | |
Title: | Maxwell & Morgan, P.C., et al., Petitioners v. Martha A. McNair |
Docketed: | December 7, 2018 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (15-17383) |
Decision Date: | June 25, 2018 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 11, 2018 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Dec 05 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 7, 2019) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 19 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 7, 2019 to February 6, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Dec 21 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 6, 2019. |
Feb 06 2019 | Brief of respondent Martha A. McNair in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 15 2019 | Reply of petitioners Maxwell & Morgan, P.C., et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 20 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2019. |
Mar 13 2019 | Rescheduled. |
Mar 18 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/22/2019. |
Mar 25 2019 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Tomio Buck Narita Counsel of Record | Simmonds & Narita LLP 44 Montgomery Street Suite 3010 San Francisco, CA 94104 tnarita@snllp.com | 4152831006 |
Party name: Maxwell & Morgan, P.C., et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Jonathan Adam Dessaules Counsel of Record | Dessaules Law Group 5353 North 16th Street, Suite 110 Phoenix, AZ 85016 jdessaules@dessauleslaw.com | 602-274-5400 |
Party name: Martha A. McNair |