No. 18-7277
Title:Shannon D. McGee, Sr., Petitioner
v.
Joseph McFadden, Warden
Docketed:January 7, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-6211)
   Decision Date:August 2, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:September 10, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 20 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 6, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jan 17 2019Waiver of right of respondent Joseph McFadden to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 31 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 11 2019Response Requested. (Due March 13, 2019)
Feb 11 2019Record Requested.
Feb 12 2019Record received from the USCA-4th Circuit. The record is available on PACER.
Feb 13 2019Record received from the USDC-SC. One restricted item was transmitted electronically, and the remainder of the record is available on PACER.
Mar 13 2019Brief of respondent Joseph McFadden in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherOtherOtherOtherOtherProof of Service
Mar 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019.
Apr 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/18/2019.
Apr 22 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2019.
May 06 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019.
May 13 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2019.
May 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/23/2019.
May 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2019.
Jun 03 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2019.
Jun 10 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2019.
Jun 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2019.
Jun 28 2019Petition DENIED. Justice Sotomayor, dissenting from denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)
Jul 16 2019Petition for Rehearing filed.
Aug 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Shannon D. McGee147120
P.O. Box 205
Ridgeville, SC 29472

Party name: Shannon McGee
Attorneys for Respondent
Melody Jane Brown
    Counsel of Record
South Carolina Attorney General's Office
Post Office Box 11549
Columbia, SC 29211

mbrown@scag.gov
803-734-3742
Party name: Joseph McFadden