No. 18-726
Title:Linda H. Lamone, et al., Appellants
v.
O. John Benisek, et al.
Docketed:December 6, 2018
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the District of Maryland
   Case Numbers:(1:13-cv-03233-JKB)
   Decision Date:November 7, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 03 2018Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due January 7, 2019)
Jurisdictional StatementAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2018Motion to affirm filed by appellees John Benisek, et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2018Opposition to motion of appellants Linda Lamone, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOtherOther
Dec 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Dec 19 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by David Trone. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 04 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by David Trone GRANTED.
Jan 04 2019Further consideration of the question of jurisdiction is POSTPONED to the hearing of the case on the merits. The case will be set for argument in the March argument session.
Jan 08 2019Appellants' briefs on the merits are to be filed on or before Friday, February 8, 2019. Appellees' briefs on the merits are to be filed on or before Monday, March 4, 2019. Reply briefs on the merits are to be filed in accordance with Rule 25.3 of the Rules of this Court. Amicus curiae briefs in support of appellants or in support of neither party are to be filed on or before Tuesday, February 12, 2019. Amicus curiae briefs in support of appellees are to be filed on or before Friday, March 8, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Appellants
Steven Marshall Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General of Maryland
200 St. Paul Place, 20th Floor
Baltimore, MD 21202

ssullivan@oag.state.md.us
4105766427
Party name: Linda Lamone, et al.
Attorneys for Appellees
Michael B. Kimberly
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown, LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mkimberly@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3127
Party name: John Benisek, et al.
Other
William James Murphy
    Counsel of Record
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
100 East Pratt Street
Suite 2440
Baltimore, MD 21202-1031

wmurphy@zuckerman.com
410-332-0444
Party name: David Trone