No. 18-725
Title:Andre Martello Barton, Petitioner
v.
William P. Barr, Attorney General
Docketed:December 6, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-13055)
   Decision Date:September 25, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 04 2018Brief of petitioner Andre Martello Barton filed. (Response due January 7, 2019)
Main Document
Dec 04 2018Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Jan 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 7, 2019 to February 6, 2019, filed.
Main Document
Jan 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 6, 2019.
Jan 31 2019Motion for an extension of time to file a response from February 6, 2019 to March 8, 2019 filed.
Main Document
Jan 31 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 8, 2019.
Mar 08 2019Brief of respondent William P. Barr, Attorney General in opposition filed.
Main Document
Mar 15 2019Reply of petitioner Andre Martello Barton filed.
Main Document
Mar 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019.
Apr 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/18/2019.
Apr 22 2019Petition GRANTED.
Apr 22 2019As Rule 34.6 provides, “If the Court schedules briefing and oral argument in a case that was governed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c) or Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 49.1(c), the parties shall submit electronic versions of all prior and subsequent filings with this Court in the case, subject to [applicable] redaction rules.” Subsequent party and amicus filings in the case should now be submitted through the Court’s electronic filing system, with any necessary redactions.
May 09 2019Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Andre Martello Barton.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 10 2019Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
May 10 2019Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including June 26, 2019. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 15, 2019.
May 20 2019Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Jun 17 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Andre Martello Barton.
Blanket Consent
Jun 26 2019Brief of petitioner Andre Martello Barton filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 02 2019Brief amici curiae of Immigration Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of National Immigrant Justice Center and American Immigration Lawyers Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Momodoulamin Jobe and The Immigrant Defense Project filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Former United States Immigration Judges filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Brief amicus curiae of Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition filed. (July 24, 2019)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, November 4, 2019.
Jul 10 2019Amicus brief of Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition not accepted for filing. (Corrected version submitted)
Aug 15 2019Brief of respondent William P. Barr, Attorney General filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUnikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6041
Party name: Andre Martello Barton
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: William P. Barr, Attorney General
Other
Jean-Claude Andre
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
555 West Fifth Street
Suite 4000
Los Angeles, CA 90013

jcandre@sidley.com
(202) 896-6000
Party name: National Immigrant Justice Center and American Immigration Lawyers Association
Ari Benjamin Asher Holtzblatt
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20006

ari.holtzblatt@wilmerhale.com
(202) 663-6964
Party name: Momodoulamin Jobe and The Immigrant Defense Project
David G. Keyko
    Counsel of Record
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
31 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019-6131

david.keyko@pillsburylaw.com
212-858-1064
Party name: Former United States Immigration Judges
Susan Leann Baker Manning
    Counsel of Record
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

susan.manning@morganlewis.com
202.373.6172
Party name: Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition
Nancy Morawetz
    Counsel of Record
Washington Square Legal Services, Inc.
245 Sullivan street
5th Floor
New York, NY 10012

nancy.morawetz@nyu.edu
(212) 998-6430
Party name: Immigration Law Professors