No. 18-719
Title:Kathleen Uradnik, Petitioner
v.
Inter Faculty Organization, et al.
Docketed:December 4, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-3086)
   Decision Date:December 3, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 04 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 3, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 12 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Kathleen Uradnik, and Respondents St. Cloud State University and the Board of Trustees of the Minnesota State Colleges and Universities.
Blanket Consent
Dec 28 2018Brief amicus curiae of Competitive Enterprise Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2019Waiver of right of respondent Inter Faculty Organization to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 02 2019Waiver of right of respondents St. Cloud State University and Board of Trustees of the MN State Colleges and Universities to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 03 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Public Policy Research Organizations and Advocacy Groups filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 09 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Jan 25 2019Response Requested. (Due February 25, 2019)
Jan 31 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 25, 2019 to March 27, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 04 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 27, 2019, for all respondents.
Feb 22 2019Amicus brief of Pacific Legal Foundation submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 22 2019Amicus brief of Goldwater Institute submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Michael Grossman
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Hostetler LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20036

agrossman@bakerlaw.com
2028611697
Party name: Kathleen Uradnik
Attorneys for Respondents
Brendan Daniel Cummins
    Counsel of Record
Cummins & Cummins, LLP
1245 International Centre
920 Second Ave. South
Minneapolis, MN 55402

brendan@cummins-law.com
612-465-0108
Party name: Inter Faculty Organization
Alan Isaac Gilbert
    Counsel of Record
Minnesota Attorney General's Office
1100 Bremer Tower
445 Minnesota Street
St. Paul, MN 55101

al.gilbert@ag.state.mn.us
651-757-1450
Party name: St. Cloud State University and Board of Trustees of the MN State Colleges and Universities
Other
William Jonathan Haun
    Counsel of Record
Shearman & Sterling LLP
401 9th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004

William.Haun@shearman.com
202.508.8056
Party name: National Association of Scholars
Jacob H. Huebert
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater Institute
500 E. Coronado Rd.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

jhuebert@goldwaterinstitute.org
6024625000
Party name: Goldwater Institute
Sam Kazman
    Counsel of Record
1310 L Street, N.W.
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20005

sam.kazman@cei.org
202-331-1010
Party name: Competitive Enterprise Institute
Thomas Ryan McCarthy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy Park, PLLC
3033 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

tom@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: Public Policy Research Organizations and Advocacy Groups
William L. Messenger
    Counsel of Record
c/o National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
8001 Braddock Road, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22160

wlm@nrtw.org
703-321-8510
Party name: National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation
Erin Elizabeth Wilcox
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

ewilcox@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation