No. 18-7187
Title:Willis Wheeler, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 27, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-3780)
   Decision Date:July 12, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:September 26, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 19 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 28, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixAppendixProof of Service
Jan 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 28, 2019 to February 27, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 28 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 27, 2019.
Feb 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 27, 2019 to March 29, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 13 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 29, 2019.
Mar 19 2019Supplemental brief of petitioner Willis Wheeler filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 26 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 29, 2029 to April 5, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 27 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 5, 2019.
Apr 05 2019Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Apr 16 2019Reply of petitioner Willis Wheeler filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 24 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019.
May 13 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Renee Domenique Pietropaolo
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
1400 Liberty Center
1001 Liberty Avenue
Pittsburgh, PA 15222

renee_pietropaolo@fd.org
4126446565
Party name: Willis Wheeler
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States