No. 18-709
Title:Maria Bentley, et al., Petitioners
v.
Victoria Vooys, et al.
Docketed:November 30, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-3912)
   Decision Date:August 21, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 19 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 31, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 28 2018Waiver of right of respondents Victoria Vooys, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 09 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Jan 17 2019Response Requested. (Due February 19, 2019)
Feb 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 19, 2019 to March 19, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 19, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Stephen Louis Braga
    Counsel of Record
University of Virginia School of Law
580 Massie Road
Washington, VA 22903

stevebraga@virginia.edu
434-924-3825
Party name: Maria Bentley, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Rhea Regina Lawrence
    Counsel of Record
Lee J. Rohn and Associates, LLC
1101 King Street
Christiansted, VI 00820

rhea@rohnlaw.com
3407788855
Party name: Victoria Vooys, et al.