No. 18-7 | |
Title: | Choctaw County, Mississippi, et al., Petitioners v. Jessica Jauch |
Docketed: | June 29, 2018 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (16-60690) |
Decision Date: | October 24, 2017 |
Rehearing Denied: | March 29, 2018 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jun 27 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 30, 2018) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Aug 15 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018. |
Aug 16 2018 | Response Requested. (Due September 17, 2018) |
Sep 05 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 17, 2018 to October 17, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Sep 07 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 17, 2018. |
Oct 17 2018 | Brief of respondent Jessica Jauch in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Oct 31 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/16/2018. |
Nov 15 2018 | Rescheduled. |
Nov 26 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018. |
Nov 29 2018 | Rescheduled. |
Dec 03 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/7/2018. |
Dec 10 2018 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Daniel J. Griffith Counsel of Record | Jacks Griffith Luciano, P.A. 150 N. Sharpe Ave. P.O. Box 1209 Cleveland, MS 38732 dgriffith@jlpalaw.com | 662-843-6171 |
Party name: Choctaw County, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Victor Israel Fleitas Counsel of Record | Victor I. Fleitas, P.A. 452 North Spring Street Tupelo, MS 38804 fleitasv@bellsouth.net | 6628400270 |
Party name: Jessica Jauch |