No. 18-689
Title:Mariano Moya, et al., Petitioners
v.
Robert Garcia, Sheriff, Santa Fe County, New Mexico, et al.
Docketed:November 26, 2018
Linked with 18A326
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2037)
   Decision Date:July 10, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 25 2018Application (18A326) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 8, 2018 to November 23, 2018, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Sep 27 2018Application (18A326) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until November 23, 2018.
Nov 21 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 26, 2018)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 26, 2018 to January 25, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 25, 2019.
Jan 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 25, 2019 to February 1, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 22 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 1, 2019.
Feb 01 2019Brief of respondents Robert Garcia, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 15 2019Reply of Mariano Moya, et al. not accepted for filing. (February 15, 2019) (Corrected version submitted)
Feb 15 2019Reply of petitioners Mariano Moya, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Linda T. Coberly
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn LLP
35 West Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60601

lcoberly@winston.com
312-558-8768
Party name: Mariano Moya, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Eric F. Citron
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

ecitron@goldsteinrussell.com
301-857-1005
Party name: Robert Garcia, et al.