No. 18-6859
Title:James Myers, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 28, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2415)
   Decision Date:July 23, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:August 29, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 26 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 28, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Dec 10 2018Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 13 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Dec 19 2018Response Requested. (Due January 18, 2019)
Jan 15 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 18, 2019 to February 19, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 15 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 19, 2019.
Feb 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 19, 2019 to March 21, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 13 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 21, 2019.
Mar 21 2019Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Apr 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2019.
May 06 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019.
May 13 2019Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of the position asserted by the Solicitor General in his brief for the United States filed on March 21, 2019. The Chief Justice, with whom Justice Thomas, Justice Alito, and Justice Kavanaugh join, dissenting. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Christopher Aaron Holt
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
112 W. Center Street, Suite 300
Fayetteville, AR 72701

aaron_holt@fd.org
4794422306
Party name: James Myers
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States