No. 18-682
Title:Manuel Enrique Santana, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 26, 2018
Linked with 18A273
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-11930)
   Decision Date:June 25, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 14 2018Application (18A273) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 23, 2018 to November 22, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Sep 18 2018Application (18A273) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until November 22, 2018.
Nov 21 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 26, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 26, 2018 to January 25, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 25, 2019.
Jan 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 25, 2019 to February 25, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 25, 2019.
Feb 25 2019Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Mar 12 2019Reply of petitioner Manuel Enrique Santana filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 13 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3000
Party name: Manuel Enrique Santana
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States