No. 18-6819 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Keith Tharpe, Petitioner
v.
Benjamin Ford, Warden
Docketed:November 26, 2018
Linked with 18A389
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-14027)
   Decision Date:April 3, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:August 10, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 09 2018Application (18A389) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 8, 2018 to November 22, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Oct 11 2018Application (18A389) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until November 22, 2018.
Nov 21 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 26, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendixAppendix
Dec 20 2018Amicus brief of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. not accepted for filing. (December 20, 2018)(Corrected version submitted)
Dec 20 2018Brief amicus curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. filed. (12/212018)
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 26, 2018 to January 25, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 25, 2019.
Jan 25 2019Brief of respondent Benjamin Ford in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOther
Feb 04 2019Notice of substitution of counsel of record of Keith Tharpe not accepted for filing. (February 04, 2019 -- Document not of the type that is to be filed electronically)
Feb 08 2019Reply of petitioner Keith Tharpe filed.
Main Document
Feb 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2019.
Mar 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2019.
Mar 18 2019Petition DENIED. Statement of Justice Sotomayor respecting the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Marcia A. Widder
    Counsel of Record
Georgia Resource Center
303 Elizabeth St NE
Atlanta, GA 30307

marcy.widder@garesource.org
(404) 222-9202
Party name: Keith Tharpe
Brian S. Kammer241 E Lake Dr
Decatur, GA 30030

brian.s.kammer@gmail.com
678-642-9951
Party name: Keith Tharpe
Attorneys for Respondent
Sabrina D. Graham
    Counsel of Record
Senior Assistant Attorney General
40 Capitol Sq., SW
Atlanta, GA 30334

sgraham@law.ga.gov
4046947975
Party name: Benjamin Ford
Other
Samuel Spital
    Counsel of Record
NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
40 Rector Street
5th Floor
New York, NY 10006

sspital@naacpldf.org
212-965-2200
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.