No. 18-679 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Erick Virgil Hall, Petitioner
v.
Idaho
Docketed:November 23, 2018
Linked with 18A261
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Idaho
   Case Numbers:(31528/41059)
   Decision Date:April 11, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:June 28, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 10 2018Application (18A261) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 26, 2018 to November 25, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Sep 14 2018Application (18A261) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until November 25, 2018.
Nov 20 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 24, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 24, 2018 to February 22, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 22, 2019.
Dec 21 2018Brief amicus curiae of Idaho Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 15 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 22, 2019 to March 25, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 25, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Charles Rothfeld
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

crothfeld@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3233
Party name: Erick Virgil Hall
Attorneys for Respondent
L. LaMont Anderson
    Counsel of Record
Idaho Attorney General's Office
700 W. State Street, 4th Floor
Boise, ID 83720-0010

lamont.anderson@ag.idaho.gov
208-334-4542
Party name: State of Idaho
Other
John J. Korzen
    Counsel of Record
Wake Forest University School of Law
P.O. Box 7206
Winston-Salem, NC 27109

korzenjj@wfu.edu
336-758-5832
Party name: Idaho Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers