No. 18-672
Title:City of Newport Beach, California, et al., Petitioners
v.
Richard Vos, et al.
Docketed:November 23, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-56791)
   Decision Date:June 11, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:August 28, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 20 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 24, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2018Waiver of right of respondents Richard Vos, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 20 2018Brief amici curiae of California State Association of Counties, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Jan 09 2019Response Requested. (Due February 8, 2019)
Jan 25 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 8, 2019 to March 10, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 11, 2019. See Rule 30.1.
Mar 11 2019Brief of respondents Richard Vos, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 25 2019Reply of petitioners City of Newport Beach, a governmental entity; Richard Henry; Nathan Farris filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 27 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019.
Apr 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/18/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel P. Barer
    Counsel of Record
Pollak, Vida and Barer
11150 W. Olympic Blvd
Suite 900
Los Angeles, CA 90064

daniel@pollakvida.com
3102031621
Party name: City of Newport Beach, a governmental entity; Richard Henry; Nathan Farris
Attorneys for Respondents
Paul Lindsey Hoffman
    Counsel of Record
Schonbrun Seplow Harris & Hoffman LLP
200 Pier Ave.
Suite 226
Hermosa Beach, CA 90254

hoffpaul@aol.com
3107177373
Party name: Richard Vos, et al.
Other
Lee Harris Roistacher
    Counsel of Record
Daley & Heft, LLP
462 Stevens Avenue, Suite 201
Solana Beach, CA 92075

lroistacher@daleyheft.com
8587555666
Party name: California State Association of Counties, et al.