No. 18-670
Title:SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, et al.
Docketed:November 21, 2018
Linked with 18A248
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-15962)
   Decision Date:June 25, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 07 2018Application (18A248) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 23, 2018 to November 22, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Sep 12 2018Application (18A248) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until November 22, 2018.
Nov 21 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 21, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 21, 2018 to January 22, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 13 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 22, 2019.
Dec 21 2018Brief amici curiae of Las Vegas Development Group, LLC, et al. filed.(12/28/2018)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 15 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 22, 2019 to February 21, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 16 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 21, 2019.
Feb 15 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 21, 2019 to March 25, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 20 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 25, 2019.
Mar 25 2019Brief of respondents Federal Housing Finance Agency, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 09 2019Reply of petitioner SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 10 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kevin K. Russell
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein and Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

krussell@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: SFR INVESTMENTS POOL 1, LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Housing Finance Agency
Other
Timothy Ervin Rhoda
    Counsel of Record
Roger P. Croteau & Associates, Ltd.
9120 West Post Road, Suite 100
Las Vegas, NV 89148

tim@croteaulaw.com
7022547775
Party name: Las Vegas Development Group, LLC; LVDG, LLC; Las Vegas Development, LLC; Thunder Properties, Inc.; Airmotive Investments, LLC; Saticoy Bay, LLC; and LN Management, LLC