No. 18-663
Title:Fredric Russell Mance, Jr., et al., Petitioners
v.
Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting Attorney General, et al.
Docketed:November 21, 2018
Linked with 18A179
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-10311)
   Decision Date:July 20, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 16 2018Application (18A179) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 18, 2018 to December 17, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 17 2018Application (18A179) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until November 19, 2018.
Nov 19 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 21, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Alan Gura
    Counsel of Record
Gura PLLC
916 Prince Street
Suite 107
Alexandria, VA 22314

alan@gurapllc.com
7038359085
Party name: Fredric Mance, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting Attorney General, et al.