No. 18-661
Title:Jason Michael Zank, Petitioner
v.
Liz Lorena Lopez Moreno
Docketed:November 21, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2397)
   Decision Date:June 14, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:August 23, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 19 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 21, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2018Waiver of right of respondent Liz Lopez Moreno to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 02 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Jan 11 2019Response Requested. (Due February 11, 2019)
Feb 11 2019Brief of respondent Liz Lopez Moreno in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2019Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Reunite International Child Abduction Centre.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 22 2019Reply of Jason Zank submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew T. Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Warner Norcross and Judd LLP
111 Lyon Street, NW
900 Fifth Third Center
Grand Rapids, MI 49503

mnelson@wnj.com
(616) 752-2539
Party name: Jason Zank
Attorneys for Respondent
Robert Anthony Alvarez
    Counsel of Record
Avanti Law Group, PLLC
600 28th St. SW
Wyoming, MI 49509

ralvarez@avantilaw.com
6162576807
Party name: Liz Lopez Moreno
Other
Kelly Ann Powers
    Counsel of Record
Miles & Stockbridge P.C.
1500 K Street NW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20005

kpowers@milesstockbridge.com
202-465-8375
Party name: Reunite International Child Abduction Centre