No. 18-648 | |
Title: | Burdette Searcey, et al., Petitioners v. James L. Dean, et al. |
Docketed: | November 19, 2018 |
Linked with 18A379 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (16-4059) |
Decision Date: | June 11, 2018 |
Rehearing Denied: | July 17, 2018 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Oct 01 2018 | Application (18A379) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 15, 2018 to November 15, 2018, submitted to Justice Gorsuch. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Oct 10 2018 | Application (18A379) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until November 14, 2018. |
Nov 14 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 19, 2018) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 19 2018 | Waiver of James Dean, et al. of right to respond not accepted for filing. (December 20, 2018) |
Dec 20 2018 | Waiver of right of respondent Debra Shelden to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Dec 20 2018 | Waiver of right of respondents Lois White, Personal Represenative for the Estate of Joseph White, et al. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Dec 21 2018 | Waiver of right of respondent James Dean to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jan 02 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019. |
Jan 09 2019 | Response Requested. (Due February 8, 2019) |
Jan 30 2019 | Brief of respondents James L. Dean, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 13 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2019. |
Feb 14 2019 | Reply of County of Gage, et al. not accepted for filing. (February 14, 2019) (Corrected version submitted) |
Feb 14 2019 | Reply of petitioners County of Gage, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 04 2019 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Melanie J. Whittamore-Mantzios Counsel of Record | Wolfe, Snowden, Hurd, Luers & Ahl, LLP 1248 O Street Suite 800 Lincoln, NE 68508 mmantzios@wolfesnowden.com | 4024741507 |
Party name: County of Gage, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Robert Franklin Bartle Counsel of Record | Bartle & Geier Law Firm 1141 H Street Lincoln, NE 68508 tpetsche@bartlegeierlaw.com | 4024762847 |
Party name: Lois White, Personal Represenative for the Estate of Joseph White, Thomas Winslow, Ada JoAnn Taylor, and Kathleen Gonzalez | ||
Maren Lynn Chaloupka | Chaloupka, Holyoke, Snyder, Chaloupka & Longoria, PC, LLO P.O. Box 2424 1714 2nd Avenue Scottsbluff, NE 69363-2424 mlc@chhsclaw.net | (308) 635-5000 |
Party name: Debra Shelden |