No. 18-640 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Nicholas Bernard Acklin, Petitioner
v.
Alabama
Docketed:November 16, 2018
Linked with 18A190
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Alabama
   Case Numbers:(CR-14-1011)
   Decision Date:December 15, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:June 15, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 13 2018Application (18A190) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 13, 2018 to November 12, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Aug 21 2018Application (18A190) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until November 12, 2018.
Nov 09 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 17, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 17, 2018 to January 16, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 04 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 16, 2019.
Dec 17 2018Brief amici curiae of Alabama Appellate Court Justices and Bar Presidents filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 17 2018Brief amici curiae of Legal Ethics Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 28 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 16, 2019 to February 15, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 15, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Patrick Mark Mulvaney
    Counsel of Record
Southern Center for Human Rights
83 Poplar Street, NW
Atlanta, GA 30303

pmulvaney@schr.org
4046881202
Party name: Nicholas Bernard Acklin
Attorneys for Respondent
John Armistead Selden
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General of the State of Alabama
501 Washington Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36130

jselden@ago.state.al.us
3343530065
Party name: State of Alabama
Other
Lisa Wright Borden
    Counsel of Record
Baker Donelson, et al
420 20th Street North
Suite 1400
Birmingham, AL 35203

lborden@bakerdonelson.com
205-328-0480
Party name: Alabama Appellate Court Justices and Bar Presidents
Catherine Mary Agnes Carroll
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

catherine.carroll@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6072
Party name: Legal Ethics Scholars