No. 18-64
Title:Juan Alberto Lucio-Rayos, Petitioner
v.
Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General
Docketed:July 12, 2018
Linked with 17A1302
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-9584)
   Decision Date:November 14, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:March 9, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 23 2018Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
May 23 2018Application (17A1302) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until July 9, 2018.
May 23 2018Application (17A1302) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 7, 2018 to July 9, 2018, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Jul 09 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 13, 2018)
Aug 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 13, 2018 to September 12, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Aug 09 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 12, 2018.
Aug 13 2018Brief amici curiae of Immigrant Defense Project et al. filed.
Sep 07 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 12, 2018.
Sep 07 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 12, 2018 to October 12, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
212-506-5380
Party name: Juan A. Lucio-Rayos
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General
Other
Jayashri Srikantiah
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Immigrants' Rights Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

jsrikantiah@law.stanford.edu
650-724-2442
Party name: Immigrant Defense Project et al.