No. 18-6286 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Lisa Jo Chamberlin, Petitioner
v.
Pelicia E Hall, Commissioner, Mississippi Department of Corrections
Docketed:October 10, 2018
Linked with 18A112
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-70012)
   Decision Date:March 20, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:May 7, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 23 2018Application (18A112) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 5, 2018 to October 4, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 01 2018Application (18A112) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until October 4, 2018.
Oct 04 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 9, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Nov 01 2018Motion of Marshall Fisher for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (November 05, 2018 - to be corrected and resubmitted)
Nov 01 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 5, 2018 to December 5, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 05 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 5, 2018.
Nov 09 2018Brief amici curiae of Retired State Court Judges filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 03 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 5, 2018 to December 19, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 19, 2018.
Dec 19 2018Brief of respondent Marshall Fisher in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOther
Dec 31 2018Reply of petitioner Lisa Jo Chamberlin filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 03 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth Unger Carlyle
    Counsel of Record
Carlyle Parish LLC
6320 Brookside Plz #516
Kansas City, MO 64113

elizabeth@carlyleparishlaw.com
(816) 525-6540
Party name: Lisa Jo Chamberlin
Attorneys for Respondent
Cameron Leigh Benton
    Counsel of Record
Mississippi Attorney General's Office
550 High Street
jackson, MS 39201

cbent@ago.state.ms.us
6624369444
Party name: Marshall Fisher
Other
Debo P. Adegbile
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Hale Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
250 Greenwich Street
New York, NY 10007

Debo.Adegbile@wilmerhale.com
212-230-8800
Party name: Retired State Court Judges