No. 18-6210
Title:Gerald P. Mitchell, Petitioner
v.
Wisconsin
Docketed:October 4, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Wisconsin
   Case Numbers:(2015AP304)
   Decision Date:July 3, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 01 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 5, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Oct 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 5, 2018 to December 5, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 5, 2018.
Dec 05 2018Brief of respondent Wisconsin in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 19 2018Reply of petitioner Gerald P. Mitchell filed. (Distributed)
OtherMain DocumentProof of Service
Dec 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 11 2019Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Thomas Brady Aquino
    Counsel of Record
State of Wisconsin - Office of the Public Defender
17 S. Fairchild Street
Madison, WI 53703

aquinot@opd.wi.gov
6082661971
Party name: Gerald P. Mitchell
Attorneys for Respondent
Daniel P. Lennington
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Department of Justice
17 W. Main St.
Madison, WI 53703

lenningtondp@doj.state.wi.us
608-267-8901
Party name: Wisconsin
Misha TseytlinWisconsin Dept. of Justice
17 W. Main Street
Madison, WI 53703

tseytlinm@doj.state.wi.us
(608) 267-9323
Party name: Wisconsin