No. 18-617
Title:Spirit Airlines, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Steven Maizes, et al.
Docketed:November 13, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-14415)
   Decision Date:August 15, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:October 12, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 13 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 13, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 26 2018Waiver of right of respondents Steven Maizes, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Dec 10 2018Response Requested. (Due January 9, 2019)
Dec 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 9, 2019 to February 8, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 8, 2019.
Jan 09 2019Brief amicus curiae of Center for Workplace Compliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 09 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2019Brief of respondents Steven Maizes, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2019Reply of petitioner Spirit Airlines, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2019.
Mar 18 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113

sdvoretzky@jonesday.com
2028793474
Party name: Spirit Airlines, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
David Michael Rosenberg-Wohl
    Counsel of Record
Hershenson Rosenberg-Wohl, A Professional Corporation
315 Montgomery Street
8th Fl.
San Francisco, CA 94104

david@hrw-law.com
(415) 829-4330
Party name: Steven Maizes, et al.
Joseph Allen SchreiberSchreiber Law Firm, PC
6 Office Park Circle
Suite 209
Birmingham, AL 35223

allen@schreiber.law
205-936-3592
Party name: Steven Maizes, et al.
Other
John Richard Annand
    Counsel of Record
NT Lakis, LLP
1501 M Street, NW Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20005

jannand@ntlakis.com
2026295600
Party name: Center for Workplace Compliance
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3000
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America