No. 18-6135 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:James K. Kahler, Petitioner
v.
Kansas
Docketed:September 28, 2018
Linked with 18A12
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Kansas
   Case Numbers:(106,981)
   Decision Date:February 9, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:May 1, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 29 2018Application (18A12) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 30, 2018 to September 28, 2018, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Lower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of ServiceMain Document
Jul 02 2018Application (18A12) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until September 28, 2018.
Sep 28 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 29, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Oct 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 29, 2018 to November 28, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 28, 2018.
Nov 28 2018Brief of respondent Kansas in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 12 2018Reply of petitioner James Kraig Kahler filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 13 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 03 2019Rescheduled.
Jan 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Jan 15 2019Record Requested.
Jan 29 2019Record received from the Supreme Court of Kansas (5 boxes).
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2019.
Mar 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2019.
Mar 18 2019Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.
Apr 16 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Kansas
Blanket Consent
Apr 17 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Apr 23 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits is granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including May 31, 2019. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 2, 2019. Petitioner will file the reply brief on the merits on or before August 30, 2019.
Apr 29 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, James Kraig Kahler.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
May 31 2019Brief of petitioner James Kraig Kahler filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 31 2019Joint appendix filed.
Main Document
Jun 03 2019Brief amici curiae of Philosophy Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 06 2019Brief amici curiae of 290 Criminal Law and Mental Health Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 07 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 07 2019Brief amicus curiae of John F. Stinneford in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 07 2019Brief amici curiae of the American Civil Liberties Union and the ACLU Foundation of Kansas filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 07 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 07 2019Brief amici curiae of Idaho Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 07 2019Brief amici curiae of American Psychiatic Association et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 07 2019Brief amici curiae of Legal Historians and Sociologists filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Sarah O'Rourke Schrup
    Counsel of Record
Northwestern Supreme Court Practicum
357 East Chicago Ave.
Chicago, IL 60611

s-schrup@law.northwestern.edu
(312) 503-0063
Party name: James Kraig Kahler
Jeffrey T. GreenSidley Austin
1501 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

jgreen@sidley.com
202 736 8291
Party name: James Kraig Kahler
Attorneys for Respondent
Toby Crouse
    Counsel of Record
Office of Attorney General Derek Schmidt
120 S.W. 10th Avenue
2nd Floor
Topeka, KS 66612

toby.crouse@ag.ks.gov
785.368.6693
Party name: Kansas
Other
Richard Jeffrey Bonnie
    Counsel of Record
University of Virginia School of Law
580 Massie Rd
Charlottesville, VA 22903

rbonnie@virginia.edu
(434) 924-3209
Party name: 290 Criminal Law and Mental Health Law Professors
Robert M. Carlson
    Counsel of Record
Corette Pohlman, et al.
129 W. Park
Butte, MT 59701

abapresident@americanbar.org
312-988-5000
Party name: American Bar Association
Eugene R. Fidell
    Counsel of Record
Feldesman Tucker Leifer Fidell LLP
1129 20th Street, N.W., Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

efidell@gmail.com
2022568675
Party name: Philosophy Professors
Caitlin Joan Halligan
    Counsel of Record
Selendy & Gay PLLC
1290 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10104

challigan@selendygay.com
(212) 390-9000
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union and the ACLU Foundation of Kansas
Jonah Joshua Horwitz
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defender Services of ldaho
702 W. ldaho St. Ste. 900
Boise, ID 83702

Jonah_Horwitz@fd.org
208 331 5530
Party name: Idaho Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al.
Jonathan L. Marcus
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom, LLP
1440 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

jonathan.marcus@skadden.com
202-371-7000
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Allison R. McLaughlin
    Counsel of Record
Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP
370 17th Street
Suite 4500
Denver, CO 80202

mclaughlin@wtotrial.com
303-244-1800
Party name: Legal Historians and Sociologists
Aaron M. Panner
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209

apanner@kellogghansen.com
2023267900
Party name: American Psychiatic Association, et al.
Andrew Timothy Tutt
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer
601 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

andrew.tutt@arnoldporter.com
9196995905
Party name: John F. Stinneford