No. 18-612
Vide 18-447
Title:CSX Transportation, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Alabama Department of Revenue, et al.
Docketed:November 9, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-11705)
   Decision Date:April 25, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:May 31, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 09 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 10, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2018Brief of respondents Alabama Department of Revenue, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 10 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Association of American Railroads filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 14 2019The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
+1 202 736 8270
Party name: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Steven Troy Marshall
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
501 Washington Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

smarshall@ago.state.al.us
3342427300
Party name: Alabama Department of Revenue, et al.
Other
Thomas Henderson Dupree Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20036

tdupree@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: The Association of American Railroads