No. 18-600
Title:Texas Advanced Optoelectronic Solutions, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Renesas Electronics America, Inc., fka Intersil Corporation
Docketed:November 7, 2018
Linked with 18A307
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2016-2121, 2016-2208, 2016-2235)
   Decision Date:July 9, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 21 2018Application (18A307) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 7, 2018 to November 5, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Sep 25 2018Application (18A307) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until November 5, 2018.
Nov 05 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 7, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Texas Advanced Optoelectronic Solutions, Inc., n/k/a ams Sensors USA Inc..
Blanket Consent
Dec 07 2018Amicus brief of Intellectual Property Professors in Support of Petitioner not accepted for filing. (December 07, 2018) (Corrected version electronically filed December 7, 2018)
Dec 07 2018Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Professors in Support of Petitioner filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2018Brief of respondent Renesas Electronics America, Inc., f/k/a Intersil Corporation in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2018Reply of petitioner Texas Advanced Optoelectronic Solutions, Inc., n/k/a ams Sensors USA Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 07 2019The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark Simon Davies
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
Columbia Center
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

mark.davies@orrick.com
202-339-8631
Party name: Texas Advanced Optoelectronic Solutions, Inc., n/k/a ams Sensors USA Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Gregory Andrew Castanias
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

gcastanias@jonesday.com
2028793639
Party name: Renesas Electronics America, Inc., f/k/a Intersil Corporation
Other
Timothy R. Holbrook
    Counsel of Record
Emory University School of Law
1301 Clifton Rd, NE
Atlanta, GA 30322

tholbrook@emory.edu
404-712-0353
Party name: Intellectual Property Professors in Support of Petitioner