No. 18-5924
Title:Evangelisto Ramos, Petitioner
v.
Louisiana
Docketed:September 11, 2018
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of Louisiana, Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2016-KA-1199)
   Decision Date:November 2, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:June 15, 2018
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 07 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 11, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionPetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 20 2018Waiver of right of respondent Louisiana to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 09 2018Response Requested. (Due November 8, 2018)
Nov 08 2018Brief of respondent Louisiana in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 27 2018Reply of petitioner Evangelisto Ramos filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2019.
Mar 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2019.
Mar 18 2019Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.
Mar 22 2019Motion to appoint counsel filed by petitioner Evangelisto Ramos.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 03 2019Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Apr 03 2019Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including June 11, 2019. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 16, 2019.
Apr 10 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2019.
Apr 29 2019Motion to appoint counsel filed by petitioner GRANTED, and G. Ben Cohen, Esq., of New Orleans, Louisiana, is appointed to serve as counsel for petitioner in this case.
Jun 11 2019Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 11 2019Brief of petitioner Evangelisto Ramos filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 17 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 18 2019Brief amici curiae of Law Professors and Social Scientists filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 18 2019Amicus brief of Prominent Current and Former State Executive and Judicial Officers, Law Professors, and the OCDLA not accepted for filing. (June 20, 2019)(Corrected version submitted)
Jun 18 2019Brief amici curiae of Prominent Current and Former State Executive and Judicial Officers, Law Professors, and the OCDLA filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 18 2019Brief amici curiae of State of New York et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 18 2019Brief amici curiae of Innocence Project New Orleans and The Innocence Project filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 18 2019Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union and the ACLU Foundation of Louisiana filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 01 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, October 7, 2019.
Aug 01 2019CIRCULATED
Aug 16 2019Brief of respondent Louisiana filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 16 2019Record requested from the Court of Appeals of Louisiana, 4th Circuit.
Aug 23 2019Amicus brief of State of Oregon not accepted for filing. (August 26, 2019) (Duplicate efiling)
Aug 23 2019Brief amicus curiae of State of Oregon filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 23 2019Brief amici curiae of State of Utah, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2019Reply of petitioner Evangelisto Ramos filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 20 2019Record received from the Court of Appeal 4th Circuit State of Louisiana, (1 Box and a pack of poster boards exhibits). Also included with the record are 2 CD's of exhibits. The CD's are electronic.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
G. Ben Cohen
    Counsel of Record
The Promise of Justice Initiative
1024 Elysian Fields Ave
New Orleans, LA 70117

benc@thejusticecenter.org
504-529-5955
Party name: Evangelisto Ramos
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth Baker Murrill
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 94005
Baton Rouge, LA 70084-9005

murrille@ag.louisiana.gov
225-326-6766
Party name: Louisiana
Other
Robert M. Carlson
    Counsel of Record
American Bar Association
321 N. Clark St.
Chicago, IL 60654

abapresident@americanbar.org
312-988-5000
Party name: American Bar Association
David D. Cole
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
915 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

dcole@aclu.org
212-549-2611
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union and the ACLU Foundation of Louisiana
Jeffrey Erwin Ellis
    Counsel of Record
Oregon Capital Resource Center
621 SW Morrison St
Ste 1025
Portland, OR 97205

jeffreyerwinellis@gmail.com
503 222 9830
Party name: Prominent Current and Former State Executive and Judicial Officers, Law Professors, and the OCDLA
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Law Professors and Social Scientists
Tyler Green
    Counsel of Record
Utah Solicitor General
350 N. State Street, Suite 230
Salt Lake City, UT 84114-2320

tylergreen@agutah.gov
(801) 538-9600
Party name: State of Utah
Benjamin Noah Gutman
    Counsel of Record
Oregon Department of Justice
1162 Court Street NE
Salem, OR 97301

benjamin.gutman@doj.state.or.us
503-378-4402
Party name: State of Oregon
Daniel Scott Harawa
    Counsel of Record
NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
700 14th Street NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20005

dharawa@naacpldf.org
2022165563
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
Wesley Patrick Hottot
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
600 University Street
Suite 1730
Seattle, WA 98101

whottot@ij.org
206-957-1300
Party name: Institute for Justice
Michael J. Lockerby
    Counsel of Record
Foley & Lardner LLP
3000 K Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20007-5109

mlockerby@foley.com
202-945-6079
Party name: The Rutherford Institute
Emily L.A. Maw
    Counsel of Record
Innocence Project New Orleans
4051 Ulloa Street
New Orleans, LA 70119

emilym@ip-no.org
504-943-1902
Party name: Innocence Project New Orleans and The Innocence Project
Timothy Patrick O'Toole
    Counsel of Record
Miller & Chevalier Chartered
900 Sixteenth St., NW
Washington, DC 20006

totoole@milchev.com
202-626-5552
Party name: The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: State of New York et al.