No. 18-587
Title:Department of Homeland Security, et al., Petitioners
v.
Regents of the University of California, et al.
Docketed:November 5, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-80008)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 05 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed. (Response due December 5, 2018)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceOther
Nov 19 2018Supplemental brief of petitioners Department of Homeland Security, et al. filed. (Corrected version submitted)
Nov 19 2018Supplemental brief of petitioners Department of Homeland Security, et al. filed. (11/28/2018)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 27 2018Letter of November 27, 2018 from the Solicitor General with respect to corrected supplemental brief of petitioners filed. (11/28/2018)
Main Document
Nov 29 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 5, 2018 to December 17, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 03 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 17, 2018, for all respondents.
Dec 04 2018Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2018Brief amici curiae of The States of Texas, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2018Brief amici curiae of Citizens United, Citizens United Foundation, English First Foundation, Public Advocate of the U.S., The Senior Citizens League, 60 Plus Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Gun Owners Foundation, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, Patriotic Vete filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of Homeland Security, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Robert Allen Long Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter
850 Tenth St., NW
Washington, DC 20001

rlong@cov.com
202-662-5612
Party name: Regents of the Univeristy of California and Janet Napolitano, President of the University of California
Michael James Mongan
    Counsel of Record
State of CA, Department of Justice
455 Golden Gate Ave., Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

michael.mongan@doj.ca.gov
(415) 510-3920
Party name: State of California
Other
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
(512) 936-1700
Party name: THE STATES OF TEXAS, ALABAMA, ARIZONA, ARKANSAS, FLORIDA, LOUISIANA, NEBRASKA, SOUTH CAROLINA, AND WEST VIRGINIA, AND GOVERNOR PHIL BRYANT OF THE STATE OF MISSISSIPPI
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

wjo@mindspring.com
7033565070
Party name: Citizens United, Citizens United Foundation, English First Foundation, Public Advocate of the U.S., The Senior Citizens League, 60 Plus Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Gun Owners Foundation, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, Patriotic Veterans, Policy Analysis Center, and Restoring Liberty Action Committee
Andrew L. Schlafly
    Counsel of Record
939 Old Chester Road
Far Hills, NJ 07931

aschlafly@aol.com
908-719-8608
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund